judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADAM ORTBERG V. GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0125
Short Caption:ADAM ORTBERG V. GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:11-CV-0125Consolidated: 11-CV-0440
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9043-10Filed Date:01/25/2011

Opening Event Date:01/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/29/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus CuriaeAmerican Civil Liberties Union of the NationN
Arthur B. SpitzerYY
Amicus CuriaeNational Lawyers Guild, D.C. ChapterN
Arthur B. SpitzerYY
AppellantAdam Ortberg Y
Jeffrey L. LightYY
AppelleeGoldman Sachs GroupN
William D. NussbaumNY
Christopher T. HandmanYN
AppelleeMichael Paese N
William D. NussbaumNY
Christopher T. HandmanNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/14/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (*CONSTRUE AS MAT - APLT GRANTED COST-WAIVED STATUS IN THE TRIAL COURT) **(RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 12/10/10) (elp)
02/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (131-pgs/mar 12/10/10 proc.)w/cd
02/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/25/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 25, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted cost-waived status in the trial court, and the statement regarding transcript and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/06/2011APPENDIX
04/18/2011AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF (Metropolitan Washington Council, AFL-CIO, The American Civil Liberties Union of the Nation's Capital and the National Lawyers Guild, D.C. Chapter)(all parties having consented to the filing)
04/19/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - of filing Amicus Curiae brief on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of the Nation's Capital.
04/20/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in appeal no. 11-CV-440 on February 4, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that the complete record on appeal has already been filed in appeal no. 11-CV-125, and that appellant Adam Ortberg's brief and the appendix were filed with this court on April 6, 2011, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-125 and 11-CV-440 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that in appeal no. 11-CV-440, appellant's brief shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' consolidated brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF - (11-CV-440) elp (Micheal Weber) appendix attached to brief
05/10/2011APPENDIX - (11-CV-440) elp
06/06/2011RECORD INDEX 11CV125 & 11-CV-440
06/06/2011RECORD COPIES 11CV125 & 11-CV-440
06/14/2011RECEIVED - Appellee's Brief, Appendix and 4 bundles of Exhibits on CDs (1A thru 1L) (submitted w/o Motion for Leave to File Out of Time - attorney notified by phone)
06/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for five days (no oppo)
06/20/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time to file the brief, and the lodged brief, and appendix including the compact disc exhibits, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellee and the appendix including the compact disc exhibits are filed. It is (MORE)
06/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/20/2011APPENDIX - (APPELLEE)
06/20/2011MISCELLANEOUS - (Compact disc exhibits to appellee's appendix) *FOUR BUNDLES OF WHITE CD'S (EXHIBIT 1A) in BLACK CASES
06/20/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that these appeals shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC) elp
06/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE the Brief and Appendix of Appellees
06/27/2011FiledTMC: MOTION TO STRIKE; OPPO
07/08/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to strike
07/12/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellants Ortberg and Weber)
09/07/2011FiledOrder Granting APPELANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE TO THE EXTENT...
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/26/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Denied as Moot
11/07/2011FiledOpposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (Appellee Goldman Sachs Group, Appellee Paese)
11/10/2011FiledTMC/APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/OPPO/motion to file (lodged) reply
11/21/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Moot. Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)
12/21/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant' motion to dismiss as moot. (FINKTE)
12/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file reply to motion to dismiss (FINKTE)
12/21/2011FiledReply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Moot. (Appellant)
01/03/2012FiledMotion to participate in oral argument (Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of the Nation, Amicus Curiae National Lawyers Guild, D.C. Chapter)Granted
08/09/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
08/14/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/15/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte holding amicus curiae motion to participate in oral argument in abeyance and referred to the merits panel upon assignement
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/05/2012FiledReceived ORDER dated 8/15/12, mailed to attorney Arthur B. Spitzer, Esquire at 1400 20th Street, NW. Suite 119, Washington, DC 20036, and returned by U.S.P.S. as "undeliverable" and remailed to the latest address of record to American Civil Liberties Union of the Nation's Capital, 4301 Connecticut Avenue, NW Suite 434, Washington, DC 2008 this date (Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of the Nation)
09/06/2012FiledOrder Granting amicus curiae to participate in oral argument.
09/12/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellee Goldman Sachs Group)Denied
09/13/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From (Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of the Nation)
09/14/2012FiledOrdered on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider this matter that appellee's emergency motion to reschedule oral argument is denied.
09/14/2012LodgedOpposition to appellee's emergency motion to reschedule oral argument (Appellant)
10/03/2012FiledArgued before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, McLeese, Reid Jeffrey L. Light, Esq. for appellant Arthur B. Spitzer, Esq. for amicus curiae Christopher T. Handman, Esq. for appellee
04/11/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and McLees, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
04/19/2013FiledMotion to reassign judge on remand (Appellant)Denied
04/19/2013FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
04/25/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellee Goldman Sachs Group)(Michael Paese)Denied
04/30/2013FiledOpposition to motion to reassign judge on remand (Appellee Goldman Sachs Group, Appellee Paese)
04/30/2013FiledOrder Denying aplts' motion to re-assign a new judge.
05/01/2013FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR COSTS...
05/07/2013FiledOrdered that appellant, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
05/21/2013FiledResponse to Appellee's Petition for Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
10/18/2013FiledOrder Denying appellee's petition for rehearing en banc
10/22/2013FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellant)Granted
10/29/2013FiledMandate (11-CV-125)
10/29/2013FiledMandate (11-CV-440)
11/20/2013FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANTS' MOTION FOR COSTS...