judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDMOND TYLER V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0177
Short Caption:EDMOND TYLER V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF19467-09Filed Date:02/10/2011

Opening Event Date:02/10/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdmond Tyler N
Robert Athanas NN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for LACK OF STANDING...OR for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... (BY: ETW)
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AND REMAND CASE TO TRIAL COURT
03/17/2011 ON FURTHER CONSIDERATION of this court's 2/28/11 order...and appellant's subsequently filed motion to dismiss the appeal and remand this case to the trial court, it is ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED, this appeal IS DISMISSED and the case is hereby REMANDED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in appellant's motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk SHALL ISSUE THE MANDATE FORTHWITH. (BY: ETW) LW
03/17/2011REMANDED
03/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED