judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSETE (JORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31553
Short Caption:ROSETE (JORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR970507Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/15/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/16/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/16/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
12/31/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Filed Order the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which we are unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. It appears that appellant was represented by Fran Archuleta during the lower court proceedings. Fran Archuleta is ordered to, within 10 days from the date of this order, file a transcript request form or a certificate stating that no transcript is required and shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C.
01/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: November 14, 1997.
01/16/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Of Proceedings.
01/20/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Of Proceedings.
01/22/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings--9/30/97. Court Reporter: Wendy Pearson.
02/11/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Telephonic Extension. Pursuant to telephonic request of February 10, 1998, the Fast Track Statement shall be served and filed on or before February 17, 1998.
02/18/1998MotionFiled Motion. Filed Petition for Additional Time to File Fast Track Statement.
03/06/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The fast track statement will be filed and served no later than March 10, 1998. No further extensions of time will be granted.
03/12/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
03/12/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
03/30/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Telephonic Extension. Pursuant to telephonic request of March 30, 1998, the Fast Track Response shall be served and filed on or before April 8, 1998.
04/09/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
04/30/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief within 40 days after the date of this order. fn1[Neither party has objected to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts to adequately inform this court of the issues raised in this appeal. We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal.] The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. fn2[Oral argument will not be scheduled.]
06/09/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 6/8/98.)
06/19/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/19/98).
06/26/1998Other Other. Filed Request for Original Exhibits.
06/26/1998Other Other. Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Request for Original Exhibits.
08/13/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On June 26, 1998, appellant filed a motion requesting this court to order the district court to transmit the original trial exhibits pursuant to NRAP 30(d). We deny appellant's motion without prejudice to appellant's right to refile a similar motion that describes the exhibits with specificity and demonstrates the necessity and relevance of each exhibit as required in NRAP 30(d).
02/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.
02/15/2000Other Other. Case submitted to the Northern Nevada Panel this date on the briefs filed herein. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
02/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/07/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Opinion. "Reversed." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML OPINION WITHDRAWN BY ORDER 05/31/00.
04/18/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 00-06155
05/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Withdrawing Opinion. On April 7, 2000, this court issued an opinion in this appeal reversing appellant Jorge Rosete's conviction of one count of grand larcency. Thereafter, the State timely petitioned this court for rehearing. We hereby direct the clerk of this court to withdraw our opinion in this matter from publication pending our resolution of the State's petition for rehearing. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-09114
07/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Granting Rehearing and Dismissing Appeal. On April 7, 2000, this court issued an opinion in this appeal reversing appellant's conviction. On April 18, 2000, the State filed a petition for Rehearing. On May 31, 2000, we issued an order withdrawing the opinion from publication pending our resolution of the State's petition for rehearing. Having reviewed appellant's remaining contentions on appeal and concluding that they all lack merit, we grant the State's petition for rehearing, issue this order in place of our prior opinion in this matter, and "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11788
08/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13576
08/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/11/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 2000. 00-13576