judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHELLE WOODS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0194)
Case Number:S-09-0194Case Docketed On:10/08/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MICHELLE WOODS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHELLE WOODS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichelle WoodsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/08/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/09/2009Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
11/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Motion to withdraw guilty plea to be filed in the District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/17/2009Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
12/14/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal