judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAWRENCE R. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0164
Short Caption:LAWRENCE R. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2115-10Filed Date:02/10/2011

Opening Event Date:02/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLawrence R. Smith Y
Rahkel BouchetNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Suzanne G. CurtNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Rahkel Bouchet, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/24/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Rahkel Bouchet, Esquire
04/05/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 24, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/14/2011RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcript (MLSRT is required)
04/18/2011RECEIVED - motion for leave to file statement re transcript. (returned for rule 27)
04/21/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
05/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)
05/12/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
05/12/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to brief)
05/24/2011RECORD INDEX
05/24/2011RECORD COPIES
06/10/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to July 18, 2011 (no oppo).
06/22/2011ORDERED: That appellant's lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
07/15/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
07/18/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/18/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 1/21/11, (94 pages, Ransom Jones)
07/18/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 1/24/11, (78 pages, S. Lindsay)
07/19/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/31/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/31/2011FiledAffirmed
11/22/2011FiledMandate