judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KRAUSE INC. VS. LITTLE

Case Information: 36406
Short Caption:KRAUSE INC. VS. LITTLECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9800966Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/27/2000 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/08/2001 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/08/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Osborne Law Office-check no. 54201.
07/11/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11987
07/27/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/01/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/14/00, 2/15/00, 2/16/00, 2/17/00, 2/18/00. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. 00-13319
08/23/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 13, 2000. 00-14815
09/18/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-16449
09/18/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/26/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-17007
10/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-17493
10/09/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/11/00. To Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 00-17791
11/08/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 1/29/01: Attached to transcript of February 10, 2000, is transcript of February 11, 2000. 00-19685
01/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Transcripts for proceedings conducted on February 11, 2000, have not yet been filed with this court. Court reporter Schonlau shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, court reporter Schonlau shall, within the same time period, file a motion with this court requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, court reporter Schonlau shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 01-01464
01/23/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellants' (Krause and Home Depot) Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/23/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-01508
01/23/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 7. 01-01511
01/26/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Supreme Court to Direct District Court Clerk to transmit Videotape Trial Exhibit as part of Record on Appeal. 01-01743
02/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. October 9, 2000, appellants filed a transcript request form requesting preparation of a transcript for proceedings conducted on February 11, 2000. On January 23, 2001, this court entered an order noting that the requested transcript had not yet been filed and directing court reporter Judith A. Schonlau to file a certified copy of the transcript within 20 days. A further review of this court's file reveals that court reporter Schonlau filed the requested transcript in a timely manner on November 8, 2000. We hereby vacate our order entered on January 23, 2001, directing court reporter Schonlau to file the transcript for proceedings conducted on February 11, 2000. 01-02358
02/21/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/21/01. 01-03292
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The district court clerk shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, certify and transmit to this court the original exhibit identified as Exhibit 4, a videotape. 01-04388
03/14/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Brief of the Nevada Trial Lawyers Association as Amicus Curiae in Support of Position of Respondent. 01-04549
03/21/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/21/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-05036
04/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On March 14, 2001, NTLA filed a motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of position of respondent. The parties have not opposed NTLA's motion. We grant the motion. NTLA shall have 20 days from the date of this order to serve and file a brief as amicus curiae. 01-06380
05/02/2001BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Trial Lawyers Association. 01-07394
08/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 8, 2001 at 9:00 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
09/24/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/08/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
11/21/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Shearing, Rose and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Rose, J. I concur: Shearing, J. Becker, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 76. NNP02 01-19548
12/10/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/10/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: Hand Delivered 12/10/01. 01-20719
12/12/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Petition for Rehearing on attorney David L. Bolnick. Due date: 10 days.
12/12/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Osborne Law Office - check no. 55087.
12/14/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. 01-21126
01/15/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-00997
01/31/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: Exhibit 4 --videotape this day. 02-01052
01/31/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02-01052