judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ENROE J. JEALOUS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0097)
Case Number:S-11-0097Case Docketed On:04/20/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ENROE J. JEALOUS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ENROE J. JEALOUS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEnroe J. JealousDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2011 WY 171
Citation:267 P.3d 1101

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/20/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/07/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/11/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Allan Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin A. Daraie for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/26/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Justin Ashkhan Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/26/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/30/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/18/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/18/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/19/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal