judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID O. WITHERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0148
Short Caption:DAVID O. WITHERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD21644-10Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid O. Withers YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mona A. Sahaf NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ubong Akpan, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ubong Akpan, Esquire
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (130pgs/Tape) 2/3/11 proc. w/CD
03/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/25/2011RECORD INDEX
03/25/2011RECORD COPIES
03/29/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/06/2011APPENDIX
06/10/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/13/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
09/19/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
09/19/2011FiledAffirmed
09/27/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed 9/27/11 (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledMandate