judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GILL (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36405
Short Caption:GILL (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36280
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991021Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/22/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/11/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11918
08/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36402, 36403, 36404, 36405, 36448. Document No. 00-13619
08/22/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-14736
08/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-05047
04/17/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-05199
04/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 10, 2001. 01-05199