judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK BRODERICK v. DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY and JONATHAN SCHRACK

Case Heading (S-11-0096)
Case Number:S-11-0096Case Docketed On:04/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:MARK BRODERICK v. DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY and JONATHAN SCHRACK
Full Title:MARK BRODERICK, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY and JONATHAN SCHRACK, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark BroderickStephen R. Winship
AppelleeDairyland Insurance CompanyAmanda Marie Good
Richard Grant Schneebeck
AppelleeJonathan SchrackCameron S. Walker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Insurance Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 22
Citation:270 P.3d 684

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/25/2011Record - Other - Defendant Dairyland Insurance Company's Certification of Transcript Request.RecordOtherFinal
05/25/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/31/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/24/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2011Brief - Appellee (Dairyland)BriefAppelleeFinal
08/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2011Brief - Appellee (Schrack)BriefAppelleeFinal
08/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Jonathan Schrack; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/23/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/29/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cameron Walker for appellee Schrack.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard G. Schneebeck, Amanda M. Good for Dairyland Insurance Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Winship for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/08/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stephen R. Winship for appellant; Richard G. Schneebeck and Cameron S. Walker for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/16/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/23/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/24/2012Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/24/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Dairyland Insurance Company's bill of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to appellee's bill of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/06/2012Order - Awarding costsOrderAwarding costsFinal
03/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 3/8/12.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal