judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAXTON INC. VS. VOA NATIONAL HOUSING CORP.

Case Information: 36412
Short Caption:SAXTON INC. VS. VOA NATIONAL HOUSING CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389300Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Buehler, BriceSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/09/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (via fax). 00-12040
07/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Emergency Motion for Stay - via fax). 00-12049
07/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. ORIGINAL Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (filed via 7/13/00). 00-12123
07/14/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (filed via fax). 00-12159
07/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Emergency Motion for Stay). 00-12168
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kolesar & Leatham, Chtd.--check no. 26575.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12259
07/17/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. ORIGINAL of Opposition to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 00-12342
07/20/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Emergency Motion for Leave of Court to File a Reply in Support of Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 00-12532
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Receipt of Copy for Emergency Motion to File a Reply. 00-12788
07/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Receipt of Copy of Reply in Support of Emergency Motion. 00-12789
07/26/2000Other Other. Filed Supplemental Affidavit of Craig S. Newman in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 00-12952
08/01/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Supplemental Affidavit of Dan R. Waite in Opposition of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (Filed via fax--ok per TH) 00-13312
08/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Granting Stay and Limited Remand for Determination of Bond Amount. fn1[We grant appellants' motion to file a reply. The clerk shall file the reply provisionally received on July 20, 2000.] We hereby grant the motion for a stay of the district court's July 11, 2000, order in case number A389300, on the condition that appellants file a bond in the district court. We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of determining the appropriate amount of the bond. The district court shall determine the bond amount within 20 days from the date of this order. Appellants shall have 20 days from the date of the district court's order setting the amount of the bond to post the bond and submit proof to the clerk of this court that the bond has been posted. Failure to comply with the bond condition will result in this court's vacation of the stay. 00-13322
08/02/2000MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 00-12533
08/02/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Supplemental Affidavit of Dan R. Waite in Opposition of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (ORIGINAL--filed via fax on 8/1/00) 00-13364
08/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Craig S. Newman Correcting Mistake Contained in Supplemental Affidavit. 00-13454
08/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Posting of Supersedeas Bond filed in district court on August 15, 2000. 00-14476
09/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-16774
09/22/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/06/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-17725
10/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Newman & Dachelet. 00-18188
10/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Newman & Dachelet for Appellants (Craig S. Newman and David W. Dachelet formerly of Kolesar & Leatham). 00-18220
10/13/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-18221
10/25/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-18853
10/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Newman & Dachelet, Ltd. Is hereby substituted as attorney for Defendants Saxton Incorporated and Lake Tonopah Limited Partnership, in the above-entitled action, in place and instead of Kolesar & Leatham, Chtd. 00-18958
02/07/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 2/5/01. 01-02466
02/07/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-02467
03/09/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 3/8/01. 01-04293
03/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-04294
03/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Reopen and Extend the Time to File Amended Respondent's Answering Brief. 01-04627
03/16/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reopen and Extend the Time to File Amended Respondents' Answering Brief. 01-04759
04/05/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-05891
04/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Additional Time to file Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. 01-06313
04/16/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Additional Time to file Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. 01-06492
04/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 9, 2001, respondent filed an answer brief and appendix. On March 15, 2001, respondent filed a "Motion To Reopen An Extend The Time To File Amended Respondents' [sic] Answering Brief." On Apirl 12, 2001, respondent filed a second motion for an extension of time to file and serve and amended answering brief. On March 16, 2001, appellants filed an opposition to respondent's first motion. Cause appearing, we deny respondent's motions for leave to file an amended answering brief. On April 5, 2001, appellants filed a motion for an extension of time to file an serve the reply brief. We grant appellants' motion. Appellants shall h ave 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief. 01-06594
04/20/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Respondent's Amended Answering Brief and Appendix.
05/09/2001BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondent's Supplemental Authorities. 01-07753
05/21/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 05/17/01. 01-08357
05/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Appellants' Motion to Strike Respondent's Supplemental Authorities and for Sanctions. 01-08715
06/05/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondent's Supplemental Authorities and for Sanctions. 01-09327
06/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Resolving Motions. Having reviewed the supplemental authorities filed by respondent, it appears they do not raise new issues or arguments and therefore comply with the requirements of NRAP 31(d). Accordingly we deny appellants' motion to strike the supplemental authorities. Pursuant to NRAP 31(d), appellants may file a supplemental memorandum if deemed necessary. 01-10923
11/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-18715
11/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having concluded that Saxton's arguments on appeal lack merit, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20307
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20400
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20400