judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRANCE L. MCNATT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0157
Short Caption:TERRANCE L. MCNATT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-4407-10Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/02/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/24/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerrance L. Mcnatt YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/25/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David H. Reiter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/25/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David H. Reiter, Esquire
03/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (14 pgs/tape) 11/2/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (135 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 12/6/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (12 pgs/tape) 12/6/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (66 pgs/Ramson-Jones) 12/7/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (185 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 12/8/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (102 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 12/9/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (143 pgs/Hawkins) 12/13/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (11 pgs/Ronan) 2/7/11 proc. w/cd
05/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011RECORD COPIES
05/18/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (SEALED documents)
06/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 21, 2011. (JAC)
07/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/22/2011FiledBrief/ Appdx attached w/cd (Appellee)
08/22/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/12/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/02/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Fisher, Schwelb
02/02/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
02/14/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
02/24/2012FiledMandate