judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL BRIAN WALKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0103)
Case Number:S-11-0103Case Docketed On:04/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DANIEL BRIAN WALKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL BRIAN WALKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel Brian WalkerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Callan Riedel

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 1
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/15/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/29/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Callan Riedel, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
09/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Callan Riedel, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and Approval for Callan Riedel to appear on behalf of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Callan Riedel, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Riedel for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/04/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 1/5/2012 by agent for Warden at Honor Conservation Camp.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/20/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/20/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/24/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/23/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/25/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 1/23/2012 by agent for Warden at Honor Conversation Camp and Boot Camp.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal