Case: 04-99-00293-CR
04-99-00293-CR
12/30/1999
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Michael Quintanilla
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/15/2001 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
10/12/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/12/2001 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
09/28/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
09/12/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
05/04/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/02/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
03/23/2001 | Petition for Review Filed | | |
02/22/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/24/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/13/2000 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/05/2000 | Submitted | | |
10/04/2000 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed | | |
10/03/2000 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
10/03/2000 | Supplemental Brief Received | | |
10/03/2000 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
10/03/2000 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
09/06/2000 | Motion to Postpone Oral Argument Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/28/2000 | Motion to Postpone Oral Argument Filed | | |
08/04/2000 | Submission | | |
07/12/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/11/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
05/19/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion Granted in Part | |
05/18/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/11/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
02/18/2000 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
02/18/2000 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
02/18/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/11/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
12/15/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/13/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
11/12/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
11/12/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
11/12/1999 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
11/02/1999 | Order Entered | | |
10/21/1999 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
10/19/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
10/19/1999 | Order Entered | | |
10/12/1999 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/28/1999 | Order Entered | | |
09/14/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/14/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/14/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/14/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/14/1999 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
08/13/1999 | Late Record Letter To Court Reporter | | |
07/15/1999 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
07/15/1999 | Clerks Record Received | | |
04/30/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
04/30/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/30/1999 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
04/30/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/28/1999 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
04/01/1999 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/12/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Michael Quintanilla | Criminal - Appellant | Richard E. Langlois |
Trial Judge, 218Th District Ct | INTERESTED PARTY | |
Court Reporter, 218Th District | INTERESTED PARTY | |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Carrie Moy |
Trial Court Information
218th Judicial District Court
Wilson
Honorable Stella H. Saxon
98-09-113-CRW
90yrs