judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUNSHINE CUSTOM PAINTS & BODY, INC., a Wyoming corporation; CYCLONE DRILLING, INC., a Wyoming corporation; and M & J SERVICES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, v. SOUTH DOUGLAS HIGHWAY WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT, a governmental unit of the State of Wyoming; and THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, a Municipal Corporation and City of the First Class

Case Heading (S-07-0017)
Case Number:S-07-0017Case Docketed On:01/22/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Cities and Towns (Title 15)
Short Title:SUNSHINE CUSTOM PAINTS & BODY, INC., a Wyoming corporation; CYCLONE DRILLING, INC., a Wyoming corporation; and M & J SERVICES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, v. SOUTH DOUGLAS HIGHWAY WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT, a governmental unit of the State of Wyoming; and THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, a Municipal Corporation and City of the First Class
Full Title:SUNSHINE CUSTOM PAINTS & BODY, INC., a Wyoming corporation; CYCLONE DRILLING, INC., a Wyoming corporation; and M & J SERVICES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. SOUTH DOUGLAS HIGHWAY WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT, a governmental unit of the State of Wyoming; and THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, a Municipal Corporation and City of the First Class, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSunshine Custom Paints & Body, Inc.Matthew Ryan Sorenson
Tad T. Daly
AppellantCyclone Drilling, Inc.Matthew Ryan Sorenson
Tad T. Daly
AppellantM & J Services, Inc.Matthew Ryan Sorenson
Tad T. Daly
AppelleeSouth Douglas Highway Water and Sewer DistrictJames L. Edwards
AppelleeThe City of GilletteCharles Anderson
Judith A. W. Studer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 206
Citation:173 P.3d 398 (Wyo. 2007)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/22/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/22/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/09/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
04/11/2007Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
04/11/2007Order - Supplement the record.OrderOtherFinal
04/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record, appelleesNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/23/2007Brief - Appellees. Joint brief of appellees.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (amended)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Judith Studer for City of GilletteNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/21/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
05/22/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argument - granting continuanceOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James L. Edwards on behalf of Appellee South Douglas Highway Water and Sewer District.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Charles W. Anderson.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Judith Studer.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Tad T. Daly and Matthew R. Sorenson.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for oral arguments. Tad T. Daly of Daly Law Associates, LLC.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented before full Court, Tad T. Daly, Matthew Ryan Sorenson appearing on behalf of the appellants and Charles W. Anderson, James L. Edwards, Judith A. W. Studer appearing on behalf of the appellees and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/20/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/07/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal