judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHERMAN DOBSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1317
Short Caption:SHERMAN DOBSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F181-79Filed Date:10/24/1980

Opening Event Date:10/24/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:04/06/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/20/1982

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSherman W. Dobson N
John T. Moran, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/24/1980NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/06/1981RECORD ON APPEAL
11/17/1981APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/17/1982APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/01/1982APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/06/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/06/1982ARGUED BEFORE JUDGES KELLY, MACK AND PRYOR.
08/23/1982OPINION PER ASSOCIATE JUDGE WILLIAM C. PRYOR. JUDGMENT AFFIRMING JUDGMENT OF CONVICTIONS....RE- MANDING # 80cf1317 FOR CORRECTION OF SENTENCE.
08/23/1982AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART
09/02/1982APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB TO OCTOBER 7th (GRANTED)
10/07/1982APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC.
12/10/1982ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING AND REHEARING EN BANC.
12/20/1982MANDATE ISSUED
02/06/1998APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall mandate and reopen appeal
03/13/1998APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION to aplt's motion to recall the mandate and reopen direct appeal
03/13/1998RECEIVED - aple's opposition to aplt's motion to recall the mandate and reopen the appeal
03/23/1998TMC - Aplt's moiton to recall the mandate - Aple's motion for leave to file file opposition - Aple's opposition (lodged)
03/31/1998ORD GRANT APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION to the motion to recall the mandate, and the Clerk shall file the lodged opposition. *** MORE ***
03/31/1998APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to aplt's motion to recall the mandate
03/31/1998ORDER DENY APLT MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall the mandate (by: STSCRD)