Case: 14-98-01019-CR
14-98-01019-CR
09/04/1998
Other Drug Possession
Delgado, Billy Jack
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/19/1999 | Case stored | | |
07/07/1999 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
07/07/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/07/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/14/1999 | No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
06/14/1999 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
05/28/1999 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
05/28/1999 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
05/20/1999 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | MOOT | |
05/14/1999 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/13/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
05/13/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
05/12/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/12/1999 | Submitted | | |
05/12/1999 | Submission | | |
05/12/1999 | Submitted | | |
05/12/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/08/1999 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
04/05/1999 | Pro Se brief DUE | | |
03/30/1999 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/25/1999 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/25/1999 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/25/1999 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/25/1999 | Mtn.withdraw as attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE, | GRANTED | |
02/16/1999 | Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA, | | |
02/16/1999 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/16/1999 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/16/1999 | Mtn.withdraw as attorney FILED-ANT,APE | | |
02/10/1999 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |
02/10/1999 | Past due brief | | |
02/05/1999 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/30/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
12/18/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/06/1998 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |
11/05/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
11/02/1998 | Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
11/02/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
10/26/1998 | Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
10/21/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
10/08/1998 | Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
09/21/1998 | Record due | | |
09/21/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
09/14/1998 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
09/08/1998 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
09/04/1998 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
09/04/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/30/1998 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
07/22/1998 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/07/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/13/2017 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Delgado, Billy Jack | PRO SE | Billy Jack Delgado |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Richard H. Branson |
Delgado, Billy Jack | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
97CR0940
45 Years TDCJ