judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICKY MCCLURKIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1333
Short Caption:RICKY MCCLURKIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F45654-75Filed Date:09/30/1980

Opening Event Date:09/30/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/18/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/02/1982
Argued/Submitted:10/06/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicky Mcclurkin N
Christian J. Mixter NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
G. William Currier NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Donald J. Allison YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCLURKIN, RICKY UNITED STATES
09/30/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/18/1981FiledRecord Completed
08/02/1982FiledBriefing Completed
10/06/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/31/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition