judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6720
A-6720
02/19/1958
Application for Writ of Error
WESTERN GUARANTY LOAN COMPANY, EMPIRE SERVICE COMPANY AND ITS OWNERS, ROYAL FINANCE COMPANY AND ITS OWNERS
ROBERT B. DEAN, BANKERS HEALTH AND ACCIDENT COMPANY, ET AL., TRIANGLE LOAN SERVICE AND W. D. CALDWELL AND MRS. J. A. WILSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/23/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/17/1958Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/10/1958Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/10/1958Response to PetitionPetitioner
03/06/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/05/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/03/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/03/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/03/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
02/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
02/19/1958Response to PetitionPetitioner
02/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
02/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/23/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/17/1958Reply to Response
03/12/1958Motion to Amend Filed
03/10/1958Reply to Response
03/10/1958Response to Petition
03/06/1958Response to Petition
03/05/1958Response to Petition
03/03/1958Response to Petition
03/03/1958Response to Petition
03/03/1958Response to Petition
02/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/19/1958Response to Petition
02/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/19/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/19/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Empire Service Company and its OwnersPetitioner
Royal Finance Company and its ownersPetitioner
Western Guaranty Loan CompanyPetitioner
Triangle Loan Service and W. D. Caldwell and Mrs. J. A. WilsonRespondent
Robert B. DeanRespondent
Bankers Health and Accident Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information