Case Information: 35046 | |||
Short Caption: | ZUREK VS. FREMER & ASSOCIATES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34415 , 43249 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A349865 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 11/04/1999 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/02/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. | ||
11/02/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton Jemison Cobeaga & List--check no. 72383. | ||
11/02/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-10655 | |
11/04/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
11/19/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal. | 99-11550 | |
12/09/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Order Extending time to file Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal with Stipulation attached. Document No. 99-12377. | ||
12/15/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal. | 99-12651 | |
12/20/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Withdrawal of Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal. | 99-12880 | |
04/26/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 23, 2000. | 00-06816 | |
06/20/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 00-10550 | |
06/20/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
07/10/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-11712 | |
07/17/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The settlement judge has filed a report with this court indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. The time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending this court's jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court. On December 20, 1999, appellant filed a motion for an extension fo time to file an opposition to respondents' motion. We grant appellant's motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file an opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss. | 00-12271 | |
07/26/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. | 00-12975 | |
09/15/2000 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a), "Respondents' Reply to Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal." | ||
09/25/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave of Court to File Reply Brief in Support of Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal. | 00-16843 | |
09/26/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. for Respondents' Reply to Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal. | 00-16975 | |
10/03/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. On September 25, respondents filed a motion for leave to file a reply to the response, and submitted a proposed reply. We grant the motion to file a reply and direct the clerk to file the prposed reply received on September 25, 2000. | 00-17464 | |
10/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Respondents' Reply to Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Frivolous Appeal. | 00-16845 | |
10/03/2000 | Other | Other. Response to Motion for Leave to File Reply and Countermotion to Recall Remittitur in case 34415 (nos. 35046/34415). | 00-17565 | |
07/12/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. NRCP 60(b) relief is not automatically precluded when an appeal has previously been taken from the judgment. We therefore deny respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal. Nevertheless, as the district court properly determined that it lacked jurisdiction, " . . . we affirm the district court's order." We deny appellant's countermotion to recall the remittitur in Docket No. 34415. fn6[We construe appellant's October 3, 2000 response to respondents' motion for leave to file a reply as a motion for reconsideration, and we deny the motion. NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-11865 | |
08/08/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-12015 | |
08/08/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/27/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. | 01-12015 |