judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6718
A-6718
02/18/1958
Application for Writ of Error
DOVIE RAY BAKER, ET AL.
TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/05/1958Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/27/1958Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/14/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/20/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
02/18/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/11/1958Returned document(s). See Remarks.
06/05/1958Response to Brief filed
05/27/1958Supplemental Brief filed
05/14/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/20/1958Response to Petition
02/18/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/18/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dovie Ray Baker, et al.Petitioner
Texas and Pacific Railway CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information