judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6764
A-6764
03/24/1958
Application for Writ of Error
CARL MILES
J. O. MARTIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/29/1958Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/24/1958Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/09/1958Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/04/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/24/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/18/1959Dissenting opinion issued.
02/18/1959Opinion issued
11/29/1958Response to Brief filed
11/24/1958Brief in Support of Petition
05/13/1958Miscellaneous Motion
05/09/1958Supplemental Brief filed
05/08/1958Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1958Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1958Document received (See Remarks)
04/09/1958Miscellaneous letter
04/04/1958Response to Petition
03/24/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/24/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carl MilesPetitioner
J. O. MartinRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information