judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6751
A-6751
03/14/1958
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF CORSICANA
JIMMY WREN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/13/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/29/1958Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
08/11/1958Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedAmicus Curiae
07/28/1958Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedAmicus Curiae
07/21/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/11/1958Appendix FiledAmicus Curiae
06/04/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/02/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/24/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/14/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/18/1958Response to Motion filed
11/13/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/05/1958Dissenting opinion issued.
10/29/1958Concurring Opinion issued.
10/29/1958Opinion issued
09/29/1958Supplemental Brief filed
08/11/1958Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
07/28/1958Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
07/21/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/11/1958Appendix Filed
06/04/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/02/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/30/1958Document received (See Remarks)
04/30/1958Document received (See Remarks)
03/24/1958Response to Petition
03/14/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/14/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jimmy Wren, et al.Respondent
Tom H. DavisAmicus Curiae
City of CorsicanaPetitioner
F. L. McMichael, et al.Amicus Curiae
League of Texas Municipalities, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information