judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6749
A-6749
03/13/1958
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. MAY PEARL FLINT, JOINED PRO FORMA BY HER HUSBAND, C. W. FLINT, JR.
A. B. CULBERTSON, RECEIVER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/09/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/12/1958Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/20/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/13/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/10/1958Dissenting opinion issued.
07/14/1958Response to Motion filed
07/09/1958Motion for Rehearing
06/25/1958Opinion issued
05/12/1958Brief on the Merits
04/23/1958Document received (See Remarks)
03/20/1958Response to Petition
03/13/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/13/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. May Pearl Flint, joined pro forma by her husband, C. W. Flint, Jr.Petitioner
A. B. Culbertson, ReceiverRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information