Case Information: 36545 | |||
Short Caption: | TOMES (DAVE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33926 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C143975 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/08/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/10/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/10/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-13966 | |
09/27/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36444, 36521, 36527, 36545, 36567, 36580, 36598. Document No. 00-17085. | ||
01/08/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 01/04/01. | 01-00331 | |
01/08/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/23/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn13[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-01533 | |
02/19/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-01578 | |
02/19/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/08/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 21, 2002. | 02-01578 |