Case Information: 36532 | |||
Short Caption: | DAYTON VALLEY AUTO SALES VS. DUFF | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI14188 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/10/2000 / Recanzone, Mario | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/08/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert A. Grayson (check). | ||
08/08/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 00-13729 | |
08/10/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Hon. Mario G. Recanzone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
08/14/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 00-14139 | |
08/24/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. | 00-14840 | |
09/29/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Withdrawal of Objection to Motion to Dismiss and Request for Dismissal. | 00-17235 | |
10/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 00-17554 | |
10/16/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." fn1[Respondent's August 14, 2000 motion to dismiss is denied as moot.] NNP/CLK | 00-18290 | |
10/16/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
10/26/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The appeal has been withdrawn. | 00-18951 |