Case: 10-99-00322-CV
10-99-00322-CV
10/20/1999
Miscellaneous civil
John T. Ash, Bill Snider, George L. Betros and Stacy Joe Ash
Hack Branch Distributing Company, Inc. and Dudley Haas Distributing Company, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/03/2008 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
04/01/2008 | Letter to trial court clerk for return of record | | |
10/24/2006 | Original exhibits returned to trial court | | |
09/27/2006 | Letter sent to parties from court | | |
12/29/2005 | Letter received | | |
03/18/2002 | Case stored | | |
03/18/2002 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
12/20/2001 | Petition for Review disposed by Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/21/2001 | Mandate recalled | | |
11/21/2001 | Petition for Review filed in the Supreme Court | | |
11/20/2001 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
08/01/2001 | Opinion issued | Aff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct | |
04/19/2000 | Submitted | | |
03/27/2000 | Submission | | |
01/18/2000 | Post-Submission Letter Brief filed | | |
01/13/2000 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
01/13/2000 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
01/13/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/21/1999 | Supplemental Clerk's Record filed | | |
12/14/1999 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
11/15/1999 | Clerk's Record filed | | |
10/20/1999 | Docketing Statement filed | | |
10/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal filed | | |
10/20/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/03/2008 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Snider, George | Appellant | Jim Dunnam |
Ash, John T. | Appellant | Jim Dunnam |
Hack Branch Distributing | Appellee | Charles D. Olson |
Ash, Stacy Joe | Appellant | Jim Dunnam |
Dudley Haas Distributing Co. | Appellee | Michael G. Cosby |
Hack Branch Distributing Co. | Appellee | Charles Alfred Mackenzie |
Betros, George L. | Appellant | Jim Dunnam |
Trial Court Information
74th District Court
McLennan
Honorable Alan M. Mayfield
99-3133-3