judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6717
A-6717
02/18/1958
Application for Writ of Error
L. M. YORK, ET UX.
WILLAIM D. MCBEE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/18/1958Letter brief Petitioner
04/02/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/12/1958Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/05/1958Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/01/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
02/18/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/18/1958Letter brief
04/08/1958Response to Motion filed
04/02/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/12/1958Response to Brief filed
03/05/1958Reply to Response
03/01/1958Response to Petition
02/18/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/18/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Willaim D. McBee, et al.Respondent
L. M. York, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information