judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GILMAN (BRIAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33610
Short Caption:GILMAN (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Esmeralda Co. - Fifth Judicial District - 680Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00255
01/28/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Harold Kuehn shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00598
02/04/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (mailed on: 02/02/99). 99-00807
02/24/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-01254
02/24/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-01256
03/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01806
03/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-01921
05/12/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On February 19, 1999, this court received appellant's proper person letter requesting appointment of new counsel. We deny appellant's request]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03871
06/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04824
06/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/23/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 10, 1999. 99-04824