judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF WILL TORRES, AN EMPLOYEE OF HOME DEPOT USA: WILL TORRES v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0123)
Case Number:S-10-0123Case Docketed On:06/03/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF WILL TORRES, AN EMPLOYEE OF HOME DEPOT USA: WILL TORRES v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF WILL TORRES, AN EMPLOYEE OF HOME DEPOT USA: WILL TORRES, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWill TorresSean W. Scoggin
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 93
Citation:253 P.3d 175

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/03/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/03/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/31/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/21/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/30/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/03/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
06/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Combined application and motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs and notice of objection; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal