judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC KING V. HORNING BROTHERS

Case Information: 11-CV-0487
Short Caption:ERIC KING V. HORNING BROTHERSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB19802-10Filed Date:04/14/2011

Opening Event Date:04/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric KingYPro SeN
AppelleeHorning BrothersN
Timothy P. ColeNY
Sheldon P. SchumanNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 3/28/11, 2/24/11, 1/11/11, 12/21/10 & 12/8/10) *(construed as the MAT)
05/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed on April 14, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted cost-waived status in the trial court and the statement regarding transcript construed as the motion for appeal transcript, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court by the Clerk of the the Superior Court of the record index/record copies and transcripts in accordance with D.C. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
08/01/2011FiledRecord Index
08/01/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (14-pgs/tape 12/8/10 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 (17-pgs/tape 12/21/10 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (80-pgs.tape 1/11/11 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #4 (76-pgs./tape 2/24/11 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (34-pgs/tape 3/28/11 proc.)w/cd
08/04/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/04/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/16/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave within 20 days
10/17/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
10/17/2011FiledDismissed
11/08/2011FiledMandate