judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTWAN MCMILLAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0457
Short Caption:ANTWAN MCMILLAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-20730-09Filed Date:04/11/2011

Opening Event Date:04/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntwan Mcmillan Y
Edward GainNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William Farley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Farley, Esquire
06/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) w/motion for appeal transcripts (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (15pgs/Tape) 3/11/11 proc. w/CD
06/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (status report filed 10/22/09; supervision summary report/notification of rearrest filed 1/14/10)
06/20/2011RECORD INDEX
06/20/2011RECORD COPIES
06/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - until August 4, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/04/2011FiledMotion for release pending appeal. (Appellant)Denied
08/08/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR RELEASE PENDING APPEAL-GOVMNT'S RESPONSE
08/11/2011FiledAnswer/Response To Appellant's Motion for Release. (Appellee)
08/12/2011FiledAnswer/Response - to aplt's motion for release pending appeal (Appellee) (USAO)
08/19/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and THE CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED BRIEF and HOLD THE MOTION FOR RELEASE IN ABEYANCE
08/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/19/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/08/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/04/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte THAT THE CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED OPPOSITION...
10/04/2011FiledOpposition to Appellant's for Release pending appeal. (Appellee)
10/04/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion for Release Pending Appeal
10/06/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider - release pending appeal (Appellant)Denied
10/07/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR RECONSDIDERATION/APDX TO APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/19/2011FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
10/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (4-pgs/tape 10/22/09 proc)
10/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record#4 (3-pgs/tape 10/29/09proc.)
10/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record#5 (10-pgs/tape 11/9/09 proc.)
10/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record #6 (5-pgs/tape 11/30/10 proc.)w/cd
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/23/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Easterly, Pryor
03/23/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
03/28/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Easterly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
04/03/2012FiledOrder Denying without prejudice aplt counsel's motion to withdrawn.
04/19/2012FiledMandate