judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEROY FRANCIS HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0144)
Case Number:S-10-0144Case Docketed On:07/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:LEROY FRANCIS HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LEROY FRANCIS HARRIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeroy Francis HarrisDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Jessica Y. Frint

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2011 WY 70
Citation:250 P.3d 163

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/17/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/30/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/29/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/10/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/15/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/30/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/07/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/25/2011Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/22/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/10/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/10/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/13/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/12/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal