judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILMOTH (DORIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33627
Short Caption:WILMOTH (DORIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117452Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/08/2000 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/08/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00343
01/29/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Attorney General has assumed representation for respondent in this matter. 99-00643
03/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-01956
03/25/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/30/98, 7/1/98, 7/7/98, 2/1/99. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 99-02169
03/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-02268
03/29/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 30, 1998 and ending on July 1, 1998 (6/30/98 Shirlee Prawalsky, 7/1/98 Debra Winn); January 7, 1999 (Shirlee Prawalsky); and February 1, 1999 (Shirlee Prawalsky). To Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky and Debra Winn. 99-02269
07/06/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 8/9/99. 99-05896
08/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-07194
08/10/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Opening Brief and appendix due: September 8, 1999. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 99-07383
09/07/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-08333
09/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-08334
09/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Declaration of Mailing 99-08426
10/01/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 9/29/99. 99-09440
10/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. for Respondent's Answering Brief. 99-09728
11/02/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 99-10648
03/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for May 8, 2000 at the hour of 9:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(SNP99B-WM/MS/NB) 00-04883
04/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-06407
05/08/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. We agree that the misdemeanor conviction is a double jeopardy violation and should therefore be vacated. We have considered Wilmoth's other arguments on appeal and conclude they are without merit. "We hereby remand this case to the district court so that an amended judgment of conviction may be entered." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14026
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14131
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14131