judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES H. GREENE V. SAFIYYAH ABDAL-HAQQ

Case Information: 11-FM-0488
Short Caption:JAMES H. GREENE V. SAFIYYAH ABDAL-HAQQClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO4089-10Filed Date:03/31/2011

Opening Event Date:03/31/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames H. Greene YPro SeN
AppelleeSafiyyah Abdal-Haqq N
Diane WeinrothNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/31/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
04/28/2011TMC - OTSC - motion to file (LODGED) ROTSC - appellee's response - appellee's motino to file LODGED supp response
05/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE (submitted by trial counsel for pro se aplt)dwm
05/20/2011RECEIVED- aplt's response to show cause
06/01/2011APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to Aplt's Motion for Leave to file response and response to this Court's Order to Show Cause
06/03/2011APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to supplement aple's response to 4/28/10 order to aplt show cause and to aplt's 5/20/11 motion
06/03/2011RECEIVED - aple's supplemental memorandum to aple's response to april 28, 2010 order to aplt to show cause to aplt's 5/20/11 motion
06/23/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged response of appellant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTIONS ARE GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged response and supplemental response of appellee. It is ****MORE*****
06/23/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
06/23/2011APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to appellant's ROTSC
06/23/2011MISCELLANEOUS-appellee's supplemental response
06/23/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY...SEE HARDCOPY (BRNBKG)
06/23/2011DISMISSED
07/15/2011FiledMandate