judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSORTATION v. STEVEN POTVIN

Case Heading (S-10-0125)
Case Number:S-10-0125Case Docketed On:06/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSORTATION v. STEVEN POTVIN
Full Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellant (Respondent), v. STEVEN POTVIN, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Jackson Matthew Engels
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Michael Thomas Kahler
AppelleeSteven PotvinGerard R. Bosch
Mark Jonathan Longfield

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2011 WY 17
Citation:247 P.3d 54

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/04/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/21/2010Brief - Appellant; and Statement of CostsBriefAppellantFinal
07/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Wyoming Department of Transportation; Statement of Costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/27/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant, Wyoming Department of Transportation.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/12/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/04/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/02/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/28/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal