judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES ROGER THORNE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0492
Short Caption:JAMES ROGER THORNE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Lead:11-CF-0492Consolidated: 11-CF-0730
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-15750-10Filed Date:04/19/2011

Opening Event Date:04/19/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/26/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/11/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/06/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Roger Thorne Y
Matthew August LefandeYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Patricia A. HeffernanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/19/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/04/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
06/14/2011 ORDERED that this court's MAY 4, 2011 OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is ***MORE****
06/14/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: ETW)
06/28/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (9 pgs/Graybill) 3/21/11 proc. w/cd
06/29/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-492 and 11-CF-730 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Murray Kamionski, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal nos. 11-CF-492 and 11-CF-730. F/O that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of ths order complete and file withthis court a consolidated statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/07/2011FiledRECORD INDEX (11-CF-730 & 492)
07/07/2011FiledRECORD COPIES (11-CF-730 & 492 )
07/29/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Thorne) 2nd
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (7 pgs/tape) 8/27/10 proc. w/cd
08/09/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/26/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/21/2011FiledAppearance by Matthew August LeFande as replacement counsel for (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Attorney Kamionski) (Appellant)Granted
12/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion of counsel for Appellant to withdraw, the appointment of Murray Kamionski, is hereby vacated.
01/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until March 27, 2012 (Appellee)Granted
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension fo time within which to file the brief to 3/27/12.
03/26/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/26/2012FiledBriefing Completed
04/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/06/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/17/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/17/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/11/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Easterly, Newman Matthew August Lefande, Esq. for appellant Patricia A. Heffernan, Esq. for appellee
11/15/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge)
12/03/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
12/04/2012FiledNotice Received corrections to the petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc filed 12/3/12. (Appellant)
12/12/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
01/29/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
02/06/2013FiledMandate
05/15/2013FiledAMENDED ORDER denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
08/16/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/09/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Thorne) (Appellant)