judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. SHANNON CAVE

Case Heading (S-10-0126)
Case Number:S-10-0126Case Docketed On:06/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. SHANNON CAVE
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Respondent/Objector), v. SHANNON CAVE, Appellee (Petitioner/Employee).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
AppelleeShannon CaveDonna D. Domonkos

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 133
Citation:261 P.3d 724

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/04/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/22/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/07/2010Motion - ReinstatementMotionReinstatement of caseFinal
07/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for reinstatement of case and brief with points and authorities; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/27/2010Order - Other - Reinstating AppealOrderOtherFinal
08/27/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant/Respondent Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee Shannon Cave; and received designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/28/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant/Respondent Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/05/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/14/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
09/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/23/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
09/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for attorney's fees and costs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
10/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/18/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/18/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/20/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal