judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REID (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36486
Short Caption:REID (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P2181Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12893
08/24/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 3, 1999. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 00-14878
08/31/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: September 12, 2000. 00-15399
09/11/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-15968
09/11/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-15969
09/28/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17159
10/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the district court's order denying the post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-18774
11/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19409
11/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2000. 00-19409