judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TROY DEAN WILLOUGHBY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0161)
Case Number:S-10-0161Case Docketed On:07/23/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:TROY DEAN WILLOUGHBY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TROY DEAN WILLOUGHBY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTroy Dean WilloughbyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:2011 WY 92
Citation:253 P.3d 157 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/23/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/08/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Index from district court clerk.Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
10/21/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/09/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, ten volumes. Volumes I-V, Original Papers; Volumes VI-IX, Transcripts; Volume X, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduled - PinedaleOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2011Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
06/15/2011Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
06/15/2011Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
06/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing, Brief in Support of Petition and Appellant's Motion to Supplement the Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/16/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - deny and Denying Motion to Supplement the RecordOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
06/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/16/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/16/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/20/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/17/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal