judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOYCE LITTLE V. D.C. SUPERIOR COURT PROBATE DIVISION

Case Information: 11-DA-0013
Short Caption:JOYCE LITTLE V. D.C. SUPERIOR COURT PROBATE DIVISIONClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC3-2745-11Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJoyce Little YPro SeN
RespondentDistrict of Columbia Superior Court Probabte Div.NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL (IFP) Held in Abeyance
05/05/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to supplement the record
05/16/2011RECEIVED- order from probate court dated 5/10/11
05/18/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER shall w/n 20 days SHOW CAUSE why this application should not be dismissed for LACK OF JURISDICTION as an associate judge's review of a magistrate judge's decision is a prerequisite for appeal... It is ****MORE****
05/18/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the AAA and the MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT IS HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (BY: ETW)
05/18/2011TMC - OTSC - motion to supplement record
06/23/2011 ORDERED that these AAA's ARE HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BRNBKG)