judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARALEE A. HOLIDAY v. CRAIG D. HOLIDAY

Case Heading (S-10-0160)
Case Number:S-10-0160Case Docketed On:07/23/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:MARALEE A. HOLIDAY v. CRAIG D. HOLIDAY
Full Title:MARALEE A. HOLIDAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. CRAIG D. HOLIDAY, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMaralee A. HolidayRobert W. Brown
Amanda Kay Roberts
AppelleeCraig D. HolidayWendy Press Sweeny

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation, Evidence
Opinion Number:247 P.3d 29 (Wyo. 2010)
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/23/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/23/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/08/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
09/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee with Statement of Costs AttachedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/15/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/18/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/14/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/31/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/16/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/16/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/22/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/18/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal