judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHUANTANG WANG V. CECILIA NG

Case Information: 11-CV-0532
Short Caption:CHUANTANG WANG V. CECILIA NGClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9027-10Filed Date:04/28/2011

Opening Event Date:04/28/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChuantang WangYPro SeN
AppelleeCecilia Ng N
Celio Young NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/24/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED since an appealable order has not been identified... (BY: ETW)
06/10/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's)
06/27/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED as being IMPROPERLY FILED... (BY: ETW) LW
06/27/2011DISMISSED
07/19/2011FiledMandate