judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WASHINGTON (BARUCH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36496
Short Caption:WASHINGTON (BARUCH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36626 , 38202 , 39754
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162774Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. 00-13231
08/21/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 00-14562
09/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15955
09/18/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: December 14, 1999; December 16, 1999; January 18, 2000; April 4, 2000; April 6, 2000; April 13 & 14, 2000; April 14, 2000; May 23, 2000. Court Reporters: Debra Van Blaricom, Shirlee Prawalsky, Kathleen Pejack. 00-16413
09/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days. 00-16861
10/23/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/18/00; 3/1/00; 4/11/00. Court Reporters: Joseph A. D'Amato and Maureen Schorn. (Submitted by Clark County Public Defender.) 00-18785
10/24/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 11 Page Fast Track Statement. 00-18782
10/25/2000Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 00-18901
10/25/2000AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-18902
11/03/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Enlargement of Page Limitation on Fast Track Statement. 00-19319
11/28/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file 13 Page Fast Track Response. 00-20712
11/28/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-21569
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion file on October 24, 2000 is granted. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement provisionally submitted on October 24, 2000. The motion filed by appellant's appellate counsel on November 3, 2000 is granted. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on October 25, 2000. The motion filed on November 28, 2000 is granted. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response and appendix provisionally submitted on November 28, 2000. 00-21244
12/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-18901
12/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-18902
12/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-21568
12/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-21569
03/15/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming and Remanding to Correct Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of entering a corrected judgment of conviction." fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-04600
04/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04712
04/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 5, 2001. 01-04712