judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARLO D. SYRING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0274)
Case Number:S-11-0274Case Docketed On:11/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:MARLO D. SYRING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARLO D. SYRING, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarlo D. SyringDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/13/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2012Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellant's briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/01/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
02/02/2012Event - Case closed - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventCase closedFinal
02/02/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/02/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal