judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUTTS (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36497
Short Caption:BUTTS (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7738Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-13235
08/02/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 17, 2000. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. Filed in district court on: July 25, 2000. 00-13341
08/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Agreement to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal pursuant to Rule 42 of Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. 00-14048
08/23/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 17, 2000. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 00-14803
09/19/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On August 11, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-16515
09/19/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.