judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROMAN IRANTON VANCE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0275)
Case Number:S-11-0275Case Docketed On:12/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ROMAN IRANTON VANCE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROMAN IRANTON VANCE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoman Iranton VanceDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Ryan T. Schelhaas

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Speedy Trial
Opinion Number:2012 WY 83
Citation:278 P.3d 254

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received (Clerk on Certificate of Service)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
12/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/19/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/19/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/06/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; Received copy of Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/16/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Redaction.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/27/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/02/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/02/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/5/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal