judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRIAN POLITI V. COLLEEN POLITI

Case Information: 11-FM-0533
Short Caption:BRIAN POLITI V. COLLEEN POLITIClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2827-08Filed Date:04/21/2011

Opening Event Date:04/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/17/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrian Politi N
Sherlock V. GrigsbyYN
AppelleeColleen PolitiN
John G. Perazich YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/13/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 8, 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcripts(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. (See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
06/01/2011 It appearing that appellant has been notified by the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court that the transcripts requested for this appeal have been prepared and are ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order make the necessary arrangements to have the transcripts transmitted to this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a notice showing that appellant has paid for the transcript and attach a copy of the receipt to the notice. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (35 pgs/tape) 3/17/09 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (120 pgs/tape) 4/8/09 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (42 pgs/tape) 6/16/10 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (70 pgs/tape) 10/7/10 proc.
06/30/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/07/2011RECORD INDEX
07/13/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (dlm)
08/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant) 9/30/11
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix (Appellant)Granted
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix (Appellant)
11/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/07/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/28/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/08/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judge Fisher, Steadman
03/23/2012FiledRemanded (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge)
04/17/2012FiledMandate
06/12/2012LodgedCourtesy copy of trial court's order of amendment issued by Judge Bayly, Jr., on May 30, 2012.