judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (KEITH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36487
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (KEITH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980066Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice AgostiPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/12/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings
07/27/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/27/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13053
07/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Ruth Morgan from the Washoe Co. Clerk's Office requesting her to send up the judgment and district court minutes for Keith Ray Williams.
08/01/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of judgment appealed from filed in district court on: April 22, 1998. 00-13306
10/03/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order Denying Motion to Correct Illegal Sentence filed on July 13, 2000. Due Date: 10 days
10/12/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Motion to Correct Illegal Sentence filed in district court on July 13, 2000. 00-18090
11/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in each of the above-identified appeals: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36487, 36806, 36828. Document No. 00-19528. 00-19528
01/12/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-00788
01/12/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-WM/CY/ML 01-21135
01/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00517
01/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00517