judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: MARK A. KEY

Case Information: 11-BG-0519
Short Caption:IN RE: MARK A. KEYClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN259-10Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Joseph Charles PerryNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentMark A. Key NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Disciplinary Hearing Commission of the North Carolina State Bar lifting a stay of suspension of respondent and actively suspending him for a period of 90 days, after which he would be eligible to petition for reinstatement, with the remainder of his suspension remaining stayed provided he complies with all the conditions set out in the order.
05/16/2011ORDER Having received a certified copy of the Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order of Discipline from the Disciplinary Hearing Commission of the North Carolina State Bar suspending respondent from the practice of law, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended for ninety days from the practice of law in the District of Columbia with his reinstatement conditioned upon a fitness requirement. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of proceedings in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
06/30/2011STATEMENT from Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline
09/29/2011FiledTMC/ NOTICE OF RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE/ OTSC/ STATEMENT OF BAR COUNSEL/ RESPONDENT TEIR's RESPONSE/ RESPONDENT MARTIN's RESPONSE/ PROPOSED ORDER/
10/06/2011FiledSuspended - ORDERED that respondent is hereby suspended for a period of ninety days with a fitness requirement. For purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (OB,ST,KG)
11/02/2011FiledReceived from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to Rule XI, Sec 14. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
06/18/2013FiledAffidavit. (not notarized) (Respondent)
06/20/2013FiledAffidavit. (Respondent)